Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mistry, Radhika N, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mistry, Avinesh, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2003 |
CategoryLegal Separation Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause OSC RE: CHILD CUSTODY PTNR PRES RESP PRES CHILD ABDUCTION UNIT HAS BEEN INVOLVED IN THIS CASE. PTNR ALREADY HAS SOLE CUSTODY W/REASONABLE VISITS TO FATHER. PTNR WAIVES CHILD SUPPORT FATHER NO LONGER LIVES IN UTAH. FATHER LIVES IN YOLO COUNTY. MOTHER NEEDS TO FILE RESPONSE TO OSC. PTNR IS REFERRED TO P SAPUNOR. STIPULATION & ORDER AFTER MEDIATION-FILED Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: RADHIKA PRASAD W/ OSC, APPL FOR ORD AND SUPP DCL, BLNK RESP DCL, BLNK POM ON 07/11/06 |
|
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 4 BOX |
|
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Issue: Child Custody ISSUE: CHILD CUST. |
|
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY (filed by respondent) |
|
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: calendar file away |
|
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Review COURT MAKES NO CHANGE IN CURRENT ORDER. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
November 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Review REVIEW DROPPED FROM CALENDAR NO APPEARANCE Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee STIP REF TO MEDIATE Notes: STIPULATION REFERRING TO MEDIATION & ORDER |
|
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause OSC:MODIF CUSTODY PETITIONER PRESENT RESPONDENT PRESENT PARTIES ORDERED TO SIGGINS; RECOM REACHED BY MEDIATORADOPTED; PARTIES WILL ATTEND LONG TERM MEDIATION W/JOHNSTONE, PARTIES TO SPLIT COST CONT TO 1-9-06 9:00AM RET ON MEDIATION DEPT 4 Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.