Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2003 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time71 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: OF 10/02/12 |
|
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause DCSS ATTY ANNE GLANZER MOTHER ANGEL GUERRA PRESENT Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause DEF ALBERTO PIZANO PRESENT MOTHER ANGEL GUERRA PRESENT DCSS ATTY GLANZER NOTICE NOT GIVEN PROPERLY, PARTIES AGREE TO CONT CNT 10/2/12 830 DEPT 121 FOR OSC Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: 9/4/12 |
|
August 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
August 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: ALBERTO PIZANO W/ ALBERTO PIZANO - CHLD SUPPT ON 8/21/12. FILED ON DEMAND - PARTY DID NOT SPECIFY WHICH DOCS WERE SERVED. |
|
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FAMILY FILE AWAY |
|
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHILD SUPPORT AND ARREARS (Filed by Angel Guerra) |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: OF 11/23/10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.