Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Smith, Clifford, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Smith, Marjorie, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1242 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL |
|
February 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING - 1/31/07 Filed by Petitioner Clifford Smith |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: CUSTODY-MEDIATION PETNR PRESENT RESPT PRESENT ORDERED TO MEDIATION W/MEDIATOR PRESENT SIGGINS STIPULATION & ORDER AFTER MEDIATION ADOPTED Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Personal Appearance APPEAR/STIP/WAIVER |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order STIP/ORD AFT MEDIATE Notes: STIPULATION & ORDER AFTER MEDIATION FILED |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE / APPLICATION FOR ORDER AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION; BLANK RESPONSIVE DECLARATION / BLANK PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Issue: Child Custody ISSUE: CHILD CUST. |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BY CLIFFORD SMITH RE: CHILD CUSTO DY; MEDIATION; JUDGMENT |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: UNDER UCCJEA-BY CLIFFORD SMITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.