Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barajas, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barajas, Joaquin, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order STIP/ORD AFT MEDIATE Notes: STIPULATION & ORDER AFTER MEDIATION |
|
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause PETITIONER PRESENT RESPONDENT PRESENT PARTIES ORDERED TO MEDIATION W/SIGGINS STIPULATION & ORDER AFTER MEDIATION Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FAMILY OSC/MTN FILE AWAY |
|
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issue: Child Custody ISSUE: CHILD CUST. |
|
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION (Filed by Petn Elizabeth Barajas_ |
|
August 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause NO APPEARANCE; DROPPED FROM CALENDAR. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
August 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause BOTH PARTIES PRESENT AND ARE REFERRED TO MEDIATION W/ DON SIGGINS. THEREAFTER A STIPULATION IS REACHED AND SO ORDERED. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
August 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION (Filed by Petn Elizabeth Barajas) |
|
August 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issue: Child Custody ISSUE: CHILD CUST. |
|
July 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issue: Child Custody ISSUE: CHILD CUST. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.