Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cram, Donna Jo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cram, Mitchel Leroy, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2001 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time371 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER - RESP MITCHELL LEROY CRAM IS THE OBLIGOR; THE PARTIES AGREE THAT THE AMOUNT OF SUPPORT PAYABLE BY OBLIGOR AS CALCULATED UNDER THE GUIDELINE IS: $965.00 PER MONTH; HOWEVER, THE PARTIES AGREE VOLUNTARILY TO CHILD SUPPORT OF $800.00 PER MONTH. RESP ORDERED TO PAY $800.00 PER MO C/S (CHILD CANDACE D CRAM IS EMANCIPATED, $800.00 FOR CHILD ASHLEY N CRAM), BEGINNING 07/01/2010; RESP TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN HEALTH INSURANCE COVERAGE FOR THE CHILDREN; EACH PARENT SHALL COMPLY W/ FC SECTION 4063 RE HEALTH CARE COSTS REIMBURSEMENT PROCEDURES AND SHALL PAY THEIR RESPECTIVE ONE-HALF SHARE OF UNINSURED HEALTH CARE COSTS INCURRED FOR THE MINOR CHILDREN. PAGE 2 WAS CORRECTED BY COURT TO REFLECT CORRECT COMMENCEMENT DATE. |
|
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS PATRICK WARD PETITIONER RESPONDENT TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AT COUNTY'S REQUEST; STIPULATION REACHED AND FORTHCOMING Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: (FILED BY PETN DONNA JO CRAM/RAY) |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: HOLDING DOCS AT JODY'S DESK UNTIL FILE IS RETRIEVED FROM MATMOR (DOCS FILED 05/26/2010) |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION RE MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT/ HEALTH CARE/OTHER: UNINSURED MEDICAL EXPENSES (FILED BY DCSS ATTY, PATRICK WARD) |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT Notes: CHILD SUPPORT | |
February 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Support Judgment ABSTRACT OF SUPPORT Notes: ABSTRACT OF SUPPORT JUDGMENT ISSUED |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL |
|
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FROM THE COURT DATE OF 12-14-2004 NO CHANGE IN ORDER AT THIS TIME-FATHERS REQUEST TO TERMINATE SPOUSAL SUPPORT IS DENIED |
|
December 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause BOTH PARTIES ARE PRESENT IN PRO PER AND SWORN DCSS ATTN PATRICK WARD PRESENT COURT SIGNS THE FORMAL ORDER RELATING TO THE CHILD SUPPORT ORDER MADE FROM THE HEARING OF 1-14-2002 IN JUDGE FALLS COURT WHICH WAS ATTACHED TO THE COUNTYS INTERVENTION NOTICE THAT WAS FILED ON 9-23-2004 NON PRO TUNC WITH NO OBJECTIONS OF THE PARTIES NOR THE COUNTY. COURT DETACHES THE ORDER AND ORDERS THE CLERKOF THIS COURT TO FILE IT. CLERK IS DIRECTED TO SEND ACOPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE COUNTY. FATHER IS REQUESTING SPOUSAL SUPPORT BE TERMINATED- COURT ORDERS: 1) MOTHER IS TO BECOME SELF SUFFICIENT BY BECOMING EMPLOYED 2) FATHERS REQUEST TO HAVE THE SPOUSAL SUPPORT TERMINATED IS DENIED AS HE IS BEHIND IN SPOUSAL SUPPORT PAYMENTS 3) THE COUNTY SHALL PREPARE THE FORMAL ORDER CONSISTANT WITH THE COURTS FINDINGS. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.