Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2000 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time6522 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER Motion to Consolidate NOTICE OF MOTION CONSOLIDATE COURT CASES Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION 1/9/18 | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTED* Notes: MOTION GRANTED TO CONSOLIDATE FS00-479 AND FL17-56 | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR
Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Review Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: 11/7/17 |
|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR
Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: OF 9/28/17 |
|
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
*Review CHILD SPT Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.