Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase, Roberta S., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chase, Jay D., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 25, 2000 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Time To Trial1053 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time546 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE GAARD |
|
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: ATTY H ROTH BIN |
|
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING OF 2/13/07 |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial Setting Conference BOTH COUNSEL PRSENT; MATTER DROPPED AT THEIR REQUEST. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING GRANTED |
|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: FILED BY ROBERTA CHASE |
|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC UNAVAIL COUNSEL Notes: UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL : HARRY ROTH, 11/20-24, 200 6, 3/12-26, 2007 |
|
October 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court NO ONE PRESENT COURT IN RECEIPT OF AN UNSIGNED STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING CONTINUANCE FEES HAVE NOT BEE PAID MATTER DROPPED FROM CALENDAR Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
October 04, 2006 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: LETTER REQUESTING CONT, NO SIGNATURES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.