Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Devries, Donald Frederick, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Devries, Mary Frances, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management3318 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 15, 2000 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Time To Trial394 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions4453 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time591 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: FOR DISPOSITION OF EXHIBITS, DEPOSITIONS OR ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS IN CIVIL ACTIONS OR PROCEEDING | |
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: AND REQUEST FOR DISPOSITION OF CIVIL EXHIBITS, DEPOSITIONS AND ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS |
|
August 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
August 13, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: OF DESTRUCTION OF CIVIL EXHIBITS, DEPOSITIONS AND ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: YASMIN C SPIEGEL WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RESP MARY CRANCES KELLER. LAST KNOWN ADDRESS FOR RESP IS 1519 BAYWOOD LANE, DAVIS CA 95619 |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MATMOR FILE AWAY |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MATMOR |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: ATTORNEY NICHOLAS R VAN MALE WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PETITIONER DONALD FREDERICK DEVRIES |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MATMOR FILE AWAY |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC UNAVAIL COUNSEL Notes: UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL - YASMIN COGSWELL SPIEGEL, ATTY FOR RESP, WILL BE UNAVAILABLE FROM 11/5/10 THROUGH 11/16/10, 11/24/10 THROUGH 11/29/10, 12/17/ 10 THROUGH 1/3/11, 1/13/11, 2/10/11 THROUGH 2/15/11, 3/10/11. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.