Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 14, 2000 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions81 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time84 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: LTR FROM YOLO COUNTY DCSS REQUESTING THAT THE MATTER CURRENTLY ON CAL FOR 03/14/2011 @ 1:30PM IN DEPT 12 BE DROPPED, AS THE CASE IS IN THE PROCESS OF CLOSING. | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: HOLDING DOC AT JODY'S DESK UNTIL FILE IS ROUTED BACK TO ME FROM DEPT 12/SUSAN BERRY |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: JEREMY COLTEN BRAZIEL W/ APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; REQUEST FOR ORDER AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION, ON 02/12/11 |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 12 BOX/SUSAN BERRY |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam APP/ORD DEBTOR EXAM Notes: (FILED BY DCSS ATTY, COLIN S ANDERSON) |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: HOLDING DOCS AT JODY'S DESK UNTIL FILE IS RETRIEVED FROM MATMOR (DOCS FILED 01/31/2011) |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - COUNTY'S REQUEST FOR SEEK WORK ORDER (FILED BY DCSS ATTY, COLIN S ANDERSON) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.