Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Gaard, Janet presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2000 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time287 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR F316-38
Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | RELATED CASE FILES Notes: UFC - RELATED CASE FILES F316-38 | |
April 24, 2001 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL |
|
April 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Support Judgment ABSTRACT OF SUPPORT Notes: ABSTRACT OF SUPPORT JUDGMENT |
|
April 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FROM CT DATE OF 4-10-01 IN DEPT 16 |
|
April 10, 2001 | Docket Event |
*Motion
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
April 10, 2001 | Docket Event |
Minute Comment MINUTE ENTRY* Notes: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT DA ANNE MILLER PRESENT NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. COURT CALLS MATTER @ 2:00PM. COURT REVIEWS DA'S CIVIL SUBPENA SERVED UPON THE DEFENDANT 3-9-2001 ORDERING HIS APPEARANCE FOR TODAY. CT FINDS DEFENDANT IS CURRENTLY WORKING FOR WAL MART @ $7.80PER HOUR. COURT WILL MAKE AN ORDER FOR PRIOR PERIODS REQUESTED. COURT ORDERS $171.00PM PERCHILD FOR A TOTAL PAYMENT OF $342.00PM FOR ELIZABETH AND QUINTON FOR THE PERIOD 6-1999 THRU JULY 1999. FOR THE MONTH OF AUGUST 1999 ZERO/M/C NO EARNING CAPACITY. FOR THE PERIOD SEPT 1999 THRU 12- 1999 CT ORDERS $171.00PM/C FOR A TOTAL SUPPORT PAYMENT OF $342.00PM. CT FINDS ARREARS TOTAL TO BE $2052.00 FOR THE PERIOD 6-1999 THRU 12-1999. DA IS ORDERED TO PREPARE THE FORMAL ORDER. |
|
March 07, 2001 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CT FILE |
|
March 07, 2001 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL |
|
March 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Support Judgment ABSTRACT OF SUPPORT Notes: ABSTRACT OF SUPPORT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.