Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 19, 2000 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions6311 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
*Motion
Date: April 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment SUPPLEMENTAL JDGM Notes: 3RD SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: WILLIAM G.SNOW | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE JUDGMENT RE PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST WILLIAM G |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: WILLIAM G. SNOW W/ 3RD SUPPLEMENTAL CMPLT AND SUMMS ON 10/18/2019 |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Supplemental Complaint Filed SUPP COMPLAINT Notes: 3RD SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FILED |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
101 MOTION* *Motion SEEK WORK Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Vacated DROPPED FROM CAL Notes: DEBTOR EXAM ONLY - LACK OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.