Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2000 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time186 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Other Hearing DETERMINATION OF SUPPORT Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS FSD#2-1714352 |
|
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST* Notes: REQUEST FOR JUDICAL DETERMINATION OF SUPPORT | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FROM 12/15/15 |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Request for Order: Modification DEFT NOT PRESENT O/P NOT PRESENT DCSS ATTY P WARD FATHER TO PAY C/S OF $0 FOR ISIAH, BEG 12/01/15 AND ONGOING. DEFT IS CURRENTLY INCARCERATED. S/D LANG ORDERED. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION, MODIFICATION, CHILD SUPPORT, STEP DOWN LANGUAGE AND UNINSURED MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
October 07, 2003 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case REQUEST OF THE COUNTY DUE TO LACK OF SERVICE Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
August 15, 2003 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam APP/ORD DEBTOR EXAM |
|
November 16, 2000 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.