Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nasatir, Laura M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hilty, Donald M, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Samuel T. McAdam presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 1997 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY OF RECORD YASMIN C. SPIE GEL FOR PETITIONER LAURA M. NASATIR |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MATMOR FILE AWAY |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED J. RICHARD SOKOL BY MAIL ON 2/15/12: INC WITHH OLDING FOR SUPPORT FILED 2/7/12 |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MATMOR FILE AWAY |
|
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Income Withholding for Support INCOME WITHHOLDING Notes: INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED J. RICHARD SOKOL BY MAIL ON 1/26/12: STIP AND ORDER FILED 12/7/12 |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING COLLEGE EDUCATION, HEALTH INSURANCE, AUTOMOBILE EXPENSES AND ATTY FEES AND COSTS, FILED BY PETITIONER |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause MATTER HEARD NO APPEARANCE NOTICE GIVEN REGARDING SETTLEMENT BY FAX (COURTESY COPY) Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Received FAX RECEIVED Notes: FAX TRANSMISSION RECEIVED FROM LAW OFFICE OF YASMIN C SPIEGEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.