Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Parker, Kelly, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Parker, Darren, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 06, 1994 |
CategoryLegal Separation With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: LETTER FROM DCSS REQUESTING HEARING ON 8/22/16 BE DROPPED | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO SEEK WORK FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam APP/ORD DEBTOR EXAM Notes: DEBTOR DARREN DANIEL PARKER FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | RELATED CASE FILES Notes: UFC - RELATED CASE FILES F316-272 | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - DARREN PARKER IN PRO PER IN PLACE OF BARBARA PEYTON FOR DARREN PARKER |
|
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING - 2/7/08 Filed by Respondent Darren Parker |
|
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Motion NOM/MOD. CHILD CUSTODY PETITIONER IN PRO PER; RESPONDENT WITH B. PEYTON. COURT ADOPTS MEDIATION REPORT AND ORDERS RESPONDENT SHALL PICK UP AND DELIVER THE CHILDREN. Judge: Shockley, Doris L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.