Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 1994 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: March 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
577 OSC/MOT MOD CHLD SPT *Request for Order: Modification DCSS P WARD DEF N/P CHILD SUPPORT ORDER AGAINST FATHER FOR MICHAEL IS $0. 00 BEGINNING MARCH, 2015 & ONGOING; MONIQUE HAS EMANCIPATED Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: OF 3/17/15 |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION; MODIFICATION, CHILD SUPPORT, STEP DOWN LANGUAGE AND UNINSURED MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
*Review DEF MICHAEL CANO-GRIMES PRESENT DCSS ATTY GLANZER PRESENT RESP TO KEEP IN CONTACT W CASE WORKER RE MEDICAL ISSUES Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: 6/10/13 |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
*Review DEF MICHAEL CANO-GRIMES DCSS WARD DEBTOR MICHAEL CANO-GRIMES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED DEF HAS MEDICAL CONDITIONS THAT ARE PREVENTING HIM FROM WORKING. DCSS DOES NOT REQ A WORK SEARCH ORDER AT THIS TIME. CONT 06/10/13 1:30 D12 REV MEDICAL CONDITION/ORDER TO LOOK FOR WORK Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: SHORT FORM FOR 02/19/13 |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC TO APPEAR Notes: NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL ON: 2/19/13 |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Warrant Filed WARR BDY ATTACH FILD Notes: WARRANT OF BODY ATTACHMENT FILED-ISSUED: 1/7/13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.