Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nardiello, Linda Joy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nardiello, Marlin A, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 1994 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause DCSS PATRICK WARD NO OTHER APPEARANCES MOTHER'S MOTION REFERRED TO D-12 BY D-14. COURT NOTES STIPULATION WAS FILED; OFF CALENDAR. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER PARTIES STIPULATE THAT RESPONDENT OWES $1,195.00 AS 1/2 SHARE OF UNINSURED MEDICAL EXPENSES AS OF 11/8/10 DCSS SHALL COLLECT AS CHILD SUPPORT ARREARS PARTIES AGREE TO CONTINUE TO COMPLY W/FC 4063 RE REIMBURSEMENT PROCEDURES OF UNINSURED HEALTH CARE COSTS. ALL OTHER ORDERS NOT MODIFIED HEREIN REMAIN IN EFFECT |
|
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: STIP AND ORDER FROM DCSS | |
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause MATTER HEARD PETNR PRESENT RESPNT PRESENT CONTINUED TO/FOR: 11-30-10 @0830AM D-12 OSC RESPNT TO REPORT TO DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES TODAY MOVING PARTY IS ORDERED TO SERVE DCSS W/OSC FILED & SUPPORTING PAPERS Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED |
|
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: MARLIN A. NARDIELLO JR. W/ OSC/DECL FOR ORDER/SUPPTNG DECL/DECL OF PYMT HIST/APP TO DETERMINE ARREARAGES ON 10/9/10. |
|
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: LORI'S FIND FILE SHELF UNTIL FILE IS RETRIEVED FROM M ATMOR |
|
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR MODIFICATION TO DETERMINE ARR EARS by Petitioner Linda Joy Nardiello |
|
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF PAYMENT HISTORY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.