Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 1994 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | COPIES OF DOCUMENTS Notes: COPIES OF DOCUMENTS TO: DCSS | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: OF 05/01/12 |
|
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: dept 12 |
|
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: ord aft hrg | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS ATTY PATRICK WARD A LOW INCOME ADJUSTMENT IS WARRANTED FATHER TO PAY SUPPORT IN THE AMOUNT OF $198 A MONTH BEGINNING 04/01/12. FATHER TO WORK WITH COUNTY AND OTHER PARENT TO OBTAIN HEALTH INSURANCE FOR CHILD. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION MOD CH SPT BY YO CO DCSS |
|
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.