Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lytle, Xanna Walker, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lytle, Thomas Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 1993 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE-STORAGE |
|
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support (Governmental) NTC OF PYMT OF SPPT Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE - XANNA WALKER NICHOL DCSS NO LONGER PROVIDING SERVICES FSD#1130032536-01 |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SEEK WORK BY YO CO DCSS |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam APP/ORD DEBTOR EXAM Notes: DEBTOR THOMAS DOUGLAS LYTLE |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: LTR FROM YO CO DCSS REQ TO DROP 1/31/12 COURT DATE FOR DEPT 12 | |
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SEEK WORK BY YO CO DCSS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.