Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Estrada, Jaime Ignacia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ortega, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Westbrook, Kellee presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management356 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: CMC
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order- Reschedule | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration (Petitioner) | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Pet Decl Re: Service of Decl of Disclosure (Prelim) | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Confidential Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.