Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gharibi, Vroyr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Babrudi, Ramina Markareh, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management317 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions317 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: CMC
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order- Reschedule | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement (Petitioner) | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Pet Decl Re: Service of Decl of Disclosure (Prelim) | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.