Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Essex Treetops L.P., A Limited Partnership, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Reynolds, Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Thomas J. Nixon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 13, 2005 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Time To Trial14 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions31 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time71 days |
Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2005-12-13T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Kathleen Reynolds
Date: December 20, 2005Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Kathleen Reynolds Granted
Date: December 21, 2005Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff
Date: December 22, 2005Judgment Entered
Date: January 13, 2006Writ of Possession - Unsatisfied Filed
Date: February 22, 2006Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: January 13, 2006Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2005-12-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Essex Treetops L.P., a limited partnership
Date: 2005-12-13T00:00:00Civil Court Trial 01/13/2006 10:30 AM D- 604
Date: December 27, 2005For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.