Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
J.J. Mac Intyre Co., Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Claros, Michelle M., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryCollections - Reduced Fee (B&P 6322.1) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions109 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3882 days |
Application and Renewal of Judgment Filed
Date: March 18, 2016Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2006-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service on Renewal of Judgment Filed
Date: March 18, 2016Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Date: July 22, 2016Initial Collection Case Review 04/20/2006 03:30 PM D- 604
Date: 2006-03-06T00:00:00Collections - Reduced Fee (B&P 6322.1) Filed
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: March 18, 2016Request Re: Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Filed
Date: 2006-03-24T00:00:00Declaration Re: Declaration of Jonathan B. Tepperson fr reduction of filing fees. Filed
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for J.J. Mac Intyre Co., Inc.
Date: March 18, 2016Proof of Service on Complaint As to Michelle M. Claros Filed
Date: 2006-02-08T00:00:00Default Judgment (Money) Entered
Date: 2006-03-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for J.J. Mac Intyre Co., Inc.
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Michelle M. Claros Filed
Date: 2006-02-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.