Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Naqvi, Imran, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time305 days |
Notice of Settlement Filed for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Date: March 06, 2006Hearing Reset to Civil OSC 10/25/2006 10:30 AM D- 604
Date: August 16, 2006Civil OSC 10/23/2006 10:30 AM D- 604
Date: March 09, 2006Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Date: December 05, 2005Initial Case Management Conference 04/20/2006 10:30 AM D- 604
Date: March 06, 2006Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 06, 2006Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: September 29, 2006Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.