Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fireside Bank, A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Sims, Deninge, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1215 days |
Initial Case Management Conference 04/20/2006 10:30 AM D- 604
Date: 2006-03-06T00:00:00Declaration of Sheryl D Noel re:venue Filed
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Fireside Bank, a California corporation
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Deninge Sims Filed
Date: 2006-02-14T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: 2006-03-06T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed
Date: April 03, 2009Claim of Exemption - Dropped
Date: November 17, 2006Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Alameda Filed
Date: March 02, 2009Summons with Proof of Service As to Deninge Sims Filed
Date: 2006-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2006-03-13T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: November 17, 2006For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.