Case Last Refreshed: 21 hours ago
Washington, Kim R, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Washington, Frederick Joe, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts Superior with Stephen Gizzi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution W/Minor Child |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Converted Image MINUTE ORDER | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof: Service | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Converted Image MINUTE ORDER | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | RFO/OSC Hearing - REQUEST FOR ORDER | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof: Service | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof: Service | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution: Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.