Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Creech, John Sr, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Kirkeby, Kristen, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Jason J. Elter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDv-100 Request For Order, Domestic Violence Prevention |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time171 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2006 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Jason Elter, Pro Tem |
||
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
May 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Domestic Violence Hearing 05/18/2006 09:02 AM D- 514 | |
May 18, 2006 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Glenn P. Oleon |
||
May 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
May 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Reissuance of Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) Granted | |
May 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 06/19/2006 09:02 AM D- 514 | |
May 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Amended Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS) Filed | |
April 11, 2006 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Thomas J. Nixon |
||
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 06/13/2006 08:30 AM D- 604 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.