Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Luong, Vi, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Xxxxxxx, Xxxx, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Susan M. Breall presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Prevention Without Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time15 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (51 PAGE) | |
May 17, 2019 | Hearing |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z
Judge: SUSAN M. BREALL |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-17-2019 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 403 | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z ON MAY-17-2019 GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER - 1YR CLETS RESTRAINING ORDER | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS), EXPIRES MAY-17-2020, FILED BY PERSON TO BE PROTECTED LUONG, VI AS TO PERSON TO BE RESTRAINED xxxxxxx, xxxx | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER LUONG, VI | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY RESPONDENT xxxxxxx, xxxx | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER LUONG, VI | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER ON CALENDAR ON MAY-17-2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 403 FILED BY RESPONDENT xxxxxxx, xxxx AS TO PETITIONER LUONG, VI | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE ATTACHED FILED BY PETITIONER LUONG, VI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.