Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cagalawan, Alma, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Maric, Olivia, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Marjorie A. Slabach presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2007 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Prevention Without Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time17 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ...SERVED ROAH ON 11/28/2007 FILED BY PETITIONER CAGALAWAN, ALMA | |
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR NOV-28-2007 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 404 | |
November 28, 2007 | Hearing |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B
Judge: MARJORIE A. SLABACH |
|
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER CAGALAWAN, ALMA | |
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B ON NOV-28-2007 GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER - CLETS RESTRAINING ORDER | |
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | STIPULATION THAT COMMISSIONER MAY ACT AS JUDGE PRO TEM SIGNED BY PETITIONER, RESPONDENT AS TO MARJORIE A. SLABACH | |
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING | |
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RESPONDENT MARIC, OLIVIA | |
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ON CALENDAR ON NOV-28-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 404 FILED BY RESPONDENT MARIC, OLIVIA AS TO PETITIONER CAGALAWAN, ALMA | |
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY PETITIONER CAGALAWAN, ALMA AS TO RESPONDENT MARIC, OLIVIA HEARING SET FOR NOV-28-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 404 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.