Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Hartmann-Gottas, Stacy, Hartmanngottas, Stacy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gottas, Mark, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Monica F. Wiley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonica F. Wiley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD: GARCIA, PAIGE M WITHDRAWN AS ATTORNEY FOR HARTMANN-GOTTAS, STACY | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF GARCIA, PAIGE M ON OCT-19-2023 THROUGH OCT-23-2023 (TRANSACTION ID # 70891391) FILED BY PETITIONER HARTMANN-GOTTAS, STACY | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS JUL-25-2023 | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND MUTUAL WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE, STIPULATION, AND WAIVERS FILED BY RESPONDENT GOTTAS, MARK | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | REMARK: JUDGMENT REVIEWED BY CLERK - FORWARDED FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT REQUEST/JUDGMENT RECEIVED SUBMITTED BY: ATTORNEY | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF GARCIA, PAIGE M ON MAR-31-2023 THROUGH APR-03-2023 AND JUN-21-23 THRU JUL-09-23(TRANSACTION ID # 69322370) FILED BY PETITIONER HARTMANN-GOTTAS, STACY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.