Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mitra, Emily G., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mitra, Anjan J., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Monica F. Wiley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Hearing |
FURTHER REVIEW HEARING FOR VISITATION, HOLIDAY AND 2024 SCHEDULE
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
August 15, 2023 | Hearing |
FURTHER REVIEW HEARING FOR VISITATION, HOLIDAY AND 2024 SCHEDULE
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
March 03, 2023 | Hearing |
DECLARATION REGARDING NOTICE AND SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY EMERGENCY (EX PARTE) ORDERS Emergency Order re: Child(ren)
Judge: RICHARD C. DARWIN |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY EMERGENCY (EX PARTE) ORDER | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-03-2023 01:30 PM FOR DEPT 405 | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING NOTICE AND SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY EMERGENCY (EX PARTE) ORDERS EMERGENCY ORDER RE: CHILD(REN) ON MAR-03-2023 GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER IN PART. DENIED IN PART | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | FURTHER REVIEW HEARING FOR VISITATION, HOLIDAY AND 2024 SCHEDULE ON AUG-15-2023 CONTINUED TO FAMILY LAW TRIAL/ SPECIAL SETTING CALENDAR ON SEP-21-2023 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 405 - PER EX PARTE ORDER | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER ON CALENDAR ON MAR-03-2023 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 405 (TRANSACTION ID # 69266001) FILED BY PETITIONER MITRA, EMILY G. AS TO RESPONDENT MITRA, ANJAN J. | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER (EX PARTE) CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION (PARENTING TIME), ENFORCEMENT OF JAN 5TH 2023, COURT ORDER ALSO PLEASE SEE ATTACHMENT 10 FILED BY RESPONDENT MITRA, ANJAN J. | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING NOTICE AND SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY EMERGENCY (EX PARTE) ORDERS EMERGENCY ORDER RE: CHILD(REN) FILED BY RESPONDENT MITRA, ANJAN J. HEARING SET FOR MAR-03-2023 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 405 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.