Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Schwartz, Suzanne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Schwartz, Alon, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 07, 2017 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions391 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time848 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (2 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED FAMILY LAW JUDGMENTS) PAID BY PETITIONER SCHWARTZ, SUZANNE | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (8 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY RESPONDENT SCHWARTZ, ALON | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER FILED BY RESPONDENT SCHWARTZ, ALON | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (30 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED FAMILY LAW JUDGMENTS) PAID BY RESPONDENT SCHWARTZ, ALON | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | OFF CALENDAR, COMPLIED WITH CASE RESOLUTION PROGRAM. JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 6/13/18. | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS JUN-04-2018 | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) AS TO RESPONDENT SCHWARTZ, ALON | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | REMARK: JUDGMENT REVIEWED BY DEFAULT CLERK AND SENT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.