Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ARMAND KNUTSEN VS. IRYNA STOYAN
On June 27, 2014 a petition for nullity without children case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Monica F. Wiley presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 27, 2014
Last Refreshed
September 28, 2022
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
PETITION FOR NULLITY WITHOUT CHILDREN
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 16 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR KOBESKY, STEPHANIE HALL AS ATTORNEY FOR KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | OFF CALENDAR, COMPLIED WITH CASE RESOLUTION PROGRAM | |
April 10, 2015 | hearing |
Day Two Long Cause Re: Nulity Of Marriage. Per Judge'S Order Matter To Be Heard By Judge Wiley.
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
April 09, 2015 | hearing |
Request For Order Re: Nulity Of Marriage
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | DAY TWO LONG CAUSE RE: NULITY OF MARRIAGE. PER JUDGE'S ORDER MATTER TO BE HEARD BY JUDGE WILEY. ON APR-10-2015 OFF CALENDAR - SETTLED BEFORE HEARING PER FAX FROM S. KOBESKY ON 2/27/15 | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: NULITY OF MARRIAGE ON APR-09-2015 OFF CALENDAR - SETTLED BEFORE HEARING PER FAX FROM S. KOBESKY ON 2/27/15 | |
February 23, 2015 | hearing |
FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE OF FEB-23-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS FEB-23-2015 | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-23-2015 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 404 | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE, STIPULATION, AND WAIVERS FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND MUTUAL WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR SCHNEIDER, CARY AS ATTORNEY FOR STOYAN, IRYNA | |
January 20, 2015 | hearing |
Other Review Hearing
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
January 14, 2015 | hearing |
Judicial Settlment Conference
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SET FOR FEB-23-2015 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 404 | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-14-2015 01:45 PM FOR DEPT 404 | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | 1/14/15 JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: SEE MINUTES | |
January 13, 2015 | hearing |
Request For Order Bifurcate Nullity
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | PETITIONER ARMAND KNUTSEN'S REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND AS TO RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-13-2015 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 404 | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR JUDICIAL SETTLMENT CONFERENCE HEARING SET FOR JAN-14-2015 AT 01:45 PM IN DEPT 404 | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER REVIEW HEARING ON JAN-20-2015 VACATED | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER BIFURCATE NULLITY ON JAN-13-2015 OFF CALENDAR. | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR BIFURCATION AND OTHER MATTERS FROM COURT FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | PETITIONER ARMAND KNUTSEN'S CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND AS TO RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER ON CALENDAR ON JAN-13-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 404 FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA AS TO PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-18-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 404 | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING, HEARD ON NOV-25-2014 | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR DAY TWO LONG CAUSE RE: NULITY OF MARRIAGE. PER JUDGE'S ORDER MATTER TO BE HEARD BY JUDGE WILEY. HEARING SET FOR APR-10-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 403 | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: NULITY OF MARRIAGE ON DEC-18-2014 CONTINUED TO FAMILY LAW TRIAL/ SPECIAL SETTING CALENDAR ON APR-09-2015 AT 01:45 PM IN DEPT. 403 - PER JUDGE'S ORDER MATTER TO BE HEARD BY JUDGE WILEY. | |
December 18, 2014 | hearing |
Request For Order Re: Nulity Of Marriage
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration OF CARY SCHNEIDER ESQ, RE: NULLITY MOTION/TRIAL, CASE MANAGEMET AND FEE REQUESTS FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND AS TO RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration OF CARY SCHENIDER RE NULLITY MOTION/TRIAL FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | COURTROOM REJECT LETTER | |
December 10, 2014 | hearing |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B ON DEC-10-2014 GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER - MUTUAL STAY\-AWAY ORDER AGREED ON | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR HEARING BEFORE TEMPORARY JUDGE | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-10-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 404 | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION RE: MUTUAL STAY-AWAY ORDER AND MOVE OUT FILED BY STOYAN, IRYNA | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER BIFURCATE NULLITY FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND AS TO RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA HEARING SET FOR JAN-13-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 404 | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
November 26, 2014 | hearing |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-26-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 404 | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NEW HARING AND ORDER ON REISSUANCE - 12/10/2014 AT 9:30AM IN DEPT 404 FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA AS TO PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B ON NOV-26-2014 CONTINUED TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B CALENDAR ON DEC-10-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 404 - APPLICATION & ORDER FOR REISSUANCE OF OSC/TRO | |
November 25, 2014 | hearing |
Request For Order: Modification Of Attorney Fees/Costs, Spousal Support (Reconsideration Retro 7/8/14), Bonus Accounting
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES/COSTS, SPOUSAL SUPPORT (RECONSIDERATION RETRO 7/8/14), BONUS ACCOUNTING ON NOV-25-2014 - SPOUSAL SUPPORT AND ATTORNEY FEES GRANTED AND SET FOR REVIEW HEARING ON JAN-20-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT. 404. | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-25-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 404 | |
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration OF ARMAND KNUTSEN IN OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR A DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike: 1.Supplemental Declaration OF CARY SCHNEIDER, ESQ. RE: CASE STATUS & REQUEST; 2. REPLY DECLARATION OF IRYNA STOYAN RE: NULLITY FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF *REPLY* OF IRYNA STOYAN RE: SUPPORT AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
November 13, 2014 | hearing |
Request For Order Re: Nulity Of Marriage
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-13-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 404 | |
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | REPLY DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF D/V R/O FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: NULITY OF MARRIAGE ON NOV-13-2014 CONTINUED TO FAMILY LAW: LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR ON DEC-18-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT. 404 - WILL NOT STIPULATE TO PRO TEM JUDGE | |
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | REPLY DECLARATION OF IRYNA STOYAN RE: NULLITY FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration OF CARY SCHENIDER, ESQ. RE CASE STATUS AND REQUEST FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER ON CALENDAR ON NOV-26-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 404 FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND AS TO RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER ON CALENDAR ON NOV-25-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 404 FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND AS TO RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA AS TO PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA AS TO PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND HEARING SET FOR NOV-26-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 404 | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY IRYNA STOYAN AGAINST ARMAND KNUTSEN | |
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ARMAND KNUTSEN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR NULLITY(REPLY) FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER ON CALENDAR ON NOV-13-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 404 FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA AS TO PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER: MODIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FEES/COSTS, SPOUSAL SUPPORT (RECONSIDERATION RETRO 7/8/14), BONUS ACCOUNTING FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA AS TO PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND HEARING SET FOR NOV-25-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 404 | |
October 21, 2014 | hearing |
Notice Declaration For Emergency Order
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY EMERGENCY COURT ORDER RE: ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AS SANCTIONS, DISCOVERY EXTENSION AND STAY FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND AS TO RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration OF ARMAND KNUTSEN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: NULLITY OF MARRIAGE FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE DECLARATION FOR EMERGENCY ORDER ON OCT-21-2014 GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER. | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-21-2014 01:30 PM FOR DEPT 404 | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE DECLARATION FOR EMERGENCY ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND AS TO RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA HEARING SET FOR OCT-21-2014 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 404 | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER ON CALENDAR ON OCT-21-2014 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 404 FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA AS TO PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
October 10, 2014 | hearing |
Request For Order Re: Nulity Of Marriage
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING, HEARD ON SEP-16-2014 | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-16-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 404 | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: SCHNEIDER, CARY SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR STOYAN, IRYNA | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: KOBESKY, STEPHANIE HALL SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: NULITY OF MARRIAGE ON OCT-10-2014 CONTINUED TO FAMILY LAW: LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR ON NOV-13-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT. 404 *AGREEMENT OF PARTIES PER FAX FROM CARY SCHNEIDER ON 9/30/14* | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER: SPOUSAL SUPPORT ON SEP-16-2014 GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER - FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING | |
September 16, 2014 | hearing |
Request For Order: Spousal Support
Judge: LINDA COLFAX |
|
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: NULITY OF MARRIAGE FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND AS TO RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA HEARING SET FOR OCT-10-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 405 | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | ***AMENDED*** PETITION FOR NULLITY OF MARRIAGE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
August 19, 2014 | hearing |
Request For Order: Spousal Support
Judge: LINDA COLFAX |
|
August 12, 2014 | hearing |
Request For Order: Spousal Support
Judge: LINDA COLFAX |
|
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER ON CALENDAR ON SEP-16-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 404 FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND AS TO RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER: SPOUSAL SUPPORT CONTINUED TO SEP-16-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 404 PER REISSUANCE | |
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR REISSUANCE OF REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND AGAINST RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR REISSUANCE OF REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA AGAINST PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER: SPOUSAL SUPPORT CONTINUED TO AUG-19-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 404 PER REISSUANCE | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons, SERVICE DATE: JUL-02-2014 FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER: SPOUSAL SUPPORT FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA AS TO PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND HEARING SET FOR AUG-12-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 404 | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NATURE OF AVAILABILITY OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION METHODS IN FAMILY LAW MATTERS FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR NULLITY FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND AS TO RESPONDENT STOYAN, IRYNA Summons ISSUED AND FILED | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ARMAND KNUTSEN FILED BY PETITIONER KNUTSEN, ARMAND |