Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Thomas, Mary, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ainsworth, Patrick, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Daniel A. Flores presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2014 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time773 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2016 | Hearing |
FAMILY LAW MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: DANIEL FLORES |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT AINSWORTH, PATRICK | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-29-2016 OFF CALENDAR - PER LRC 11.13.D.1., NO STATEMENTS SUBMITTED BY EITHER PARTY BY 7/19/16 | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-29-2016 OFF CALENDAR - PER LRC 11.13.D.1., NO MSC STATEMENTS SUBMITTED BY EITHER PARTY BY 7/19/16. | |
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, MARY | |
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, MARY | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RESPONDENT AINSWORTH, PATRICK | |
April 29, 2016 | Hearing |
FAMILY LAW MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: DANIEL FLORES |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-29-2016 CONTINUED TO FAMILY LAW MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUL-29-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT. 404 - PER SIGNED STIPULATION AND ORDER | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, MARY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.