Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pfuhl, Adriana I., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pfuhl, Richard E., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 21, 2013 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Without Children |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions906 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time974 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS JUN-06-2016 | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) AS TO RESPONDENT PFUHL, RICHARD E. | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | COMMUNITY AND QUASI-COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER PFUHL, ADRIANA I. | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | * JUDGMENT REVIEWED BY DEFAULT CLERK AND SENT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW * | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFAULT REQUEST/JUDGMENT RECEIVED SUBMITTED BY: PRO PER | |
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: JUL-09-2015 FILED BY PETITIONER PFUHL, ADRIANA I. | |
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER PFUHL, ADRIANA I. | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION, SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PETITIONER PFUHL, ADRIANA I. AS TO RESPONDENT PFUHL, RICHARD E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.