Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Silva, Jennifer, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Silva, Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 27, 2013 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions545 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2153 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (1999 COMERICA INCORPORATED AMENDED AND RESTATED DEFERRED COMPENSATION PLAN) FILED BY RESPONDENT SILVA, MICHAEL | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY RESPONDENT SILVA, MICHAEL | |
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DIVISION OF PENSION PLAN BENEFITS AND QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER FILED BY RESPONDENT SILVA, MICHAEL | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY RESPONDENT SILVA, MICHAEL | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER STIPULATION FOR DIVISION OF SAVINGS PLAN (COMERICA INCORPORATED PREFERRED SAVINGS PLAN) FILED BY RESPONDENT SILVA, MICHAEL | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT FILED BY PETITIONER SILVA, JENNIFER | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS DEC-31-2014 | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.