Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shen, Xiaolan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lu, Xiaohua, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Without Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time210 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD: HEATH, TERRANCE C. WITHDRAWN AS ATTORNEY FOR SHEN, XIAOLAN | |
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS JUL-13-2011 | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S FIRST APPEARANCE FEE RCV'D | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S FIRST APPEARANCE FEE | |
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFAULT REQUEST/JUDGMENT RECEIVED FROM ATTORNEY | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE, STIPULATION, AND WAIVERS FILED BY PETITIONER SHEN, XIAOLAN | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND MUTUAL WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.