Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tan, Xin Dan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Yu, Jian Ping, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Richard C. Darwin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions113 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2696 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2018 | Hearing |
REQUEST FOR ORDER FOR CHANGE OF Child Custody, Visitation (Parenting Time), Child Support
Judge: RICHARD C. DARWIN |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (12 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED FAMILY LAW JUDGMENTS) PAID BY PETITIONER TAN, XIN DAN | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER FOR CHANGE OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION (PARENTING TIME), CHILD SUPPORT ON MAY-07-2018 OFF CALENDAR - PER STIPULATIONS AND ORDERS FOR CUSTODY AND VISITATION AND SUPPORT SIGNED 4/12/18 | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO ESTABLISH OR MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT AND ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER TAN, XIN DAN AS TO RESPONDENT YU, JIAN PING | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED BY PETITIONER TAN, XIN DAN ALSO FILED BY RESPONDENT YU, JIAN PING | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RESPONDENT YU, JIAN PING | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER TAN, XIN DAN | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER FOR CHANGE OF CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION (PARENTING TIME), CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY PETITIONER TAN, XIN DAN AS TO RESPONDENT YU, JIAN PING HEARING SET FOR MAY-07-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 404 | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER TAN, XIN DAN ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 | |
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CUSTODY AND/OR VISITATION OF CHILDREN (MODIFICATION) FILED BY PETITIONER TAN, XIN DAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.