Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Xxxxx, Xxxx, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Xxxxx, Xxxxxx, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2010 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions268 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time336 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS MAY-10-2011 | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event | LEGAL REJECT LETTER | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) (I&E DECLARATION ATTACHED) AS TO RESPONDENT xxxxx, xxxxxx | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF xxxx xxxxx FILED BY PETITIONER xxxxx, xxxx | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER xxxxx, xxxx | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECK LIST | |
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFAULT REQUEST/JUDGMENT RECEIVED FROM ATTORNEY | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS *AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHED* FILED BY PETITIONER xxxxx, xxxx |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.