Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ralston, Amy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Reynolds, Danny Allen, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Michael I. Begert presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2007 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1049 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time3434 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND RELATED MATTERS FILED BY RESPONDENT REYNOLDS, DANNY ALLEN | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF RUBIN, NANCY GAIL ON DEC-19-2014 THROUGH JAN-05-2015 03/27/2015-04/06/2015 AND MONICA J. LEVAVI FILED BY PETITIONER RALSTON, AMY | |
September 30, 2014 | Hearing |
REQUEST FOR ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF CUSTODY AND/OR VISITATION
Judge: MICHAEL ISAKU BEGERT |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CUSTODY AND VISITATION SCHOOL ATTENDANCE, AND ANCILLARY ISSUES | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF CUSTODY AND/OR VISITATION ON SEP-30-2014 OFF CALENDAR - SETTLED BEFORE HEARING | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-30-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 403 | |
August 21, 2014 | Hearing |
REQUEST FOR ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF CUSTODY AND/OR VISITATION
Judge: MICHAEL ISAKU BEGERT |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF CUSTODY AND/OR VISITATION ON AUG-21-2014 CONTINUED TO FAMILY LAW OSC/ CUSTODY/ VISITATION A CALENDAR ON SEP-30-2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 403 | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-21-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 403 | |
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | MINOR'S COUNSEL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS FILED BY RESPONDENT REYNOLDS, DANNY ALLEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.