Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Aliaksandravich, Hostseu Mikhail, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Barysauna, Miakinina Yelena, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Rebecca L. Wightman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2019 |
CategoryRegister Of Out Of State Support Order |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time175 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 06/25/19-PERSON SERVED- MIAKININA YELENA BARYSAUNA; MIKHAIL ALIAKSANDRAVICH HOSTSEU | |
June 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion: Motion To Clarify The Amount Of Monthly Child Support
Judge: REBECCA L. WIGHTMAN |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION: MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AMOUNT OF MONTHLY CHILD SUPPORT ON JUN-25-2019 - GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-25-2019 08:30 AM FOR DEPT 416 | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING HEARD ON 6/25/19 FILED BY OTHER COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT - SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES (IN - SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY) | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION: MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AMOUNT OF MONTHLY CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY OTHER COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO RESPONDENT BARYSAUNA, MIAKININA YELENA HEARING SET FOR JUN-25-2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 416 | |
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF AN INTERNATIONAL HAGUE CONVENTION SUPPORT ORDER FILED 01/09/2019 AND NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT- PERSON SERVED - MIAKININA YELENA BARYSAUNA; MIKHAIL ALIAKSANDRAVICH HOSTSEU | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | REGISTER OF OUT OF STATE SUPPORT ORDER *** NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF AN INTERNATIONAL HAGUE CONVENTION (BELARUS) SUPPORT ORDER *** DCSS# 200000002140460 FILED BY PETITIONER ALIAKSANDRAVICH, HOSTSEU MIKHAIL AS TO RESPONDENT BARYSAUNA, MIAKININA YELENA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.