Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ct Dss-Ocss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Canulla, Joshua Paul, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 15, 2016 |
CategoryUifsa/Responding |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions816 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time826 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY OTHER COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES UNIFORM SUPPORT PETITION, SUMMONS AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT FILED 12/15/2016; PERSON SERVED: KARIN ANN REED | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | UIFSA / RESPONDING DCSS#200000001847964 FILED BY PETITIONER CT DSS-OCSS AS TO RESPONDENT CANULLA, JOSHUA PAUL SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.