Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Xxxxx, Xxxxxx, County Of San Francisco, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Xxxxx, Jonas, Xxxxx, Xxxxxx, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Rebecca L. Wightman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2016 |
CategoryStatement Of Registration Of Foreign/California Support Order |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time73 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 6/8/16 - PERSON(S) SERVED- xxxxxxxxxxxx; JONAS xxxxx; KELLY REITER | |
June 08, 2016 | Hearing |
REQUEST FOR ORDER OF CHILD SUPPORT Challenge Of Registration
Judge: REBECCA L. WIGHTMAN |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | 6/8/16 HEARING: SEE MINUTES | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES - HEARD ON 6/8/2016 | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-08-2016 08:30 AM FOR DEPT 416 | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER ON CALENDAR ON JUN-08-2016 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 416 FILED BY PETITIONER COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO RESPONDENT xxxxx, xxxxxx | |
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES REQUEST FOR ORDER FOR MODIFICATION FOR CHILD SUPPORT FILED 04/27/2016- PERSON(S) SERVED- JONAS xxxxx | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER OF CHILD SUPPORT CHALLENGE OF REGISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER xxxxx, xxxxxx AS TO RESPONDENT xxxxx, JONAS HEARING SET FOR JUN-08-2016 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 416 | |
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES -NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT - SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE AND STATEMENT OF REGISTRATION OF CALIFORNIA SUPPORT ORDER FILED 4/8/16. SERVED TO xxxxxxxxxxxx, KELLY REITER/LAW OFFICES OF KELLY REITER; JONAS xxxxx | |
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT - SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES (IN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.