Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of San Francisco, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Cheng-Shimizu, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2015 |
CategorySummons And Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Case Cycle Time46 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES -STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS AND JUDGMENT 9/28/15. SERVED TO KEVIN CHENG-SHIMIZU; HONEY CHAI | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS AND JUDGMENT | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS -SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PROPOSED JUDGMENT, ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SERVED SEP-16-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO RESPONDENT CHENG-SHIMIZU, KEVIN | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PROPOSED JUDGMENT FILED 8/21/2015; PERSONS SERVED: HONEY CHAI | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS DCSS#200000001592577 FILED BY PETITIONER COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO RESPONDENT CHENG-SHIMIZU, KEVIN SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.