Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Harvey, Jacquelyn E, City & Co Of Sf, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Chambers, Nettie, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2008 |
CategoryUniform Insterstate Support Document |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time246 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS AND JUDGMENT | |
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, SERVICE DATE: MAY-08-2009 FILED BY PETITIONER CITY & CO OF SF AS TO RESPONDENT CHAMBERS, NETTIE | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES (SUMMONS AND PETITION, PROPOSED JUDGMENT) | |
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event | UNIFORM INTERSTATE SUPPORT DOCUMENT FILED BY PETITIONER CITY & CO OF SF FILED AGAINST RESPONDENT CHAMBERS, NETTIE SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.