Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
City And County Of San Francisco, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Perkins, Eddie J, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2006 |
CategorySummons And Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF CALIFORNIA SUPPORT ORDER FROM COUNTY OF ALAMEDA RECEIVE NOTICE FROM ALAMEDA COUNTY. CASE NUMBER HF20065582 FILED AS OF 6/16/2020. | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF CALIFORNIA SUPPORT ORDER FROM COUNTY OF ALAMEDA RECEIVE NOTICE FROM ALAMEDA COUNTY. CASE NUMBER HF20064714 FILED AS OF 6/9/2020. | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT - SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES (OUT - SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY) | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE (OUT)- PERSON SERVED-EDDIE J PERKINS; LATESHA D LEWIS | |
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (CSS) FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES | |
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS AND JUDGMENT | |
December 12, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES | |
December 12, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, SERVICE DATE: NOV-13-2006 FILED BY PETITIONER CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO RESPONDENT PERKINS, EDDIE J | |
December 12, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION AMENDED PROPOSED JUDGMENT | |
November 03, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.