Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Reynoso, Angelina, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Dgdg 18, Llc, General Motors, Llc, The Golden 1 Credit Union, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Alesia F. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2023 |
CategoryCb - Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059693 Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel further Responses to Special Interrogatories Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents TENTATIVE RULING On February 16, 2024,... | |
March 03, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059693 Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel further Responses to Special Interrogatories Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents TENTATIVE RULING On February 16, 2024,... | |
March 02, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059693 Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel further Responses to Special Interrogatories Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents TENTATIVE RULING On February 16, 2024,... | |
March 01, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059693 Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel further Responses to Special Interrogatories Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents TENTATIVE RULING On February 16, 2024,... | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT REYNOSO, ANGELINA |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
UNLIMITED COMPLAINT REYNOSO, ANGELINA |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED REYNOSO, ANGELINA |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE COVER SHEET REYNOSO, ANGELINA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.