Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
D, A Minor, M, filed a(n) Cc - Civil Complaint case against Anderson Simmons, A Minor, Jordyn, Benicia Unified School District, Blackman, A Minor, Victoria, Doe Employee, Hanna, Paul, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Christine A. Carringer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2023 |
CategoryCc - Civil Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059675 BUSD and HANNA’s Motion to Strike TENTATIVE RULING Defendants BENICIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (“BUSD”) and PAUL HANNA (“HANNA”) move to strike the references to Government Code sections 815.... | |
December 29, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059675 BUSD and HANNA’s Motion to Strike TENTATIVE RULING Defendants BENICIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (“BUSD”) and PAUL HANNA (“HANNA”) move to strike the references to Government Code sections 815.... | |
December 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059675 BUSD and HANNA’s Motion to Strike TENTATIVE RULING Defendants BENICIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (“BUSD”) and PAUL HANNA (“HANNA”) move to strike the references to Government Code sections 815.... | |
December 27, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059675 BUSD and HANNA’s Motion to Strike TENTATIVE RULING Defendants BENICIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (“BUSD”) and PAUL HANNA (“HANNA”) move to strike the references to Government Code sections 815.... | |
December 25, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059675 BUSD and HANNA’s Motion to Strike TENTATIVE RULING Defendants BENICIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (“BUSD”) and PAUL HANNA (“HANNA”) move to strike the references to Government Code sections 815.... | |
December 23, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059675 BUSD and HANNA’s Motion to Strike TENTATIVE RULING Defendants BENICIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (“BUSD”) and PAUL HANNA (“HANNA”) move to strike the references to Government Code sections 815.... | |
December 22, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059675 BUSD and HANNA’s Motion to Strike TENTATIVE RULING Defendants BENICIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (“BUSD”) and PAUL HANNA (“HANNA”) move to strike the references to Government Code sections 815.... | |
December 21, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059675 BUSD and HANNA’s Motion to Strike TENTATIVE RULING Defendants BENICIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (“BUSD”) and PAUL HANNA (“HANNA”) move to strike the references to Government Code sections 815.... | |
December 20, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059675 BUSD and HANNA’s Motion to Strike TENTATIVE RULING Defendants BENICIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (“BUSD”) and PAUL HANNA (“HANNA”) move to strike the references to Government Code sections 815.... | |
December 19, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | FCS059675 BUSD and HANNA’s Motion to Strike TENTATIVE RULING Defendants BENICIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (“BUSD”) and PAUL HANNA (“HANNA”) move to strike the references to Government Code sections 815.... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.