Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chin, Kimberly Y. filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Specialized Education Services, Inc. Dba Sierra School, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Wendy Getty presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy Getty Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL SPECIALIZED EDUCATION SERVICES, INC. DBA SIERRA SCHOOL, |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL SOLANO COUNTY OFFICE OF EDUCATION, |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL HEARING | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL (PARTY ONLY) SPECIALIZED EDUCATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC., |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE SOLANO COUNTY OFFICE OF EDUCATION, |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL (PARTY ONLY) SOLANO COUNTY OFFICE OF EDUCATION, |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TWO SPECIALIZED EDUCATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC., |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION SPECIALIZED EDUCATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC., |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.