Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
D. Gregg Doyle, Trustee Of The D. Gregg Doyle Recovable Livi, Giselle Shepatin, Trustee Of The Giselle Shepatin Recovable, Sanchez, Orlando Ricardo, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Atc Specialties, Inc., Business Alliance Insurance Company, Cosgrove, Anthony W., represented by Mccormick, James L., in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Earl Bradley Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL ATC SPECIALTIES, INC., |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL SANCHEZ, ORLANDO RICARDO |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL D. GREGG DOYLE, TRUSTEE OF THE D. GREGG DOYLE RECOVABLE LIVI, |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL (PARTY ONLY) ATC SPECIALTIES, INC., |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL (PARTY ONLY) SANCHEZ, ORLANDO RICARDO |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED D. GREGG DOYLE, TRUSTEE OF THE D. GREGG DOYLE RECOVABLE LIVI, |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.