Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
City And County Of San Francisco, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Todd Jr, William, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 26, 2005 |
CategorySummons And Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions197 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Case Cycle Time217 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES | |
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS | |
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT | |
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PETITIONER CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO RESPONDENT TODD JR, WILLIAM | |
September 26, 2005 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, SERVICE DATE: AUG-23-2005 FILED BY PETITIONER CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO RESPONDENT TODD JR, WILLIAM | |
August 03, 2005 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT) | |
July 26, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS FSB # 96982 FILED BY PETITIONER CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO RESPONDENT TODD JR, WILLIAM SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.